FL H0705 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates act the "Florida First Step Act"; requires DOC to provide inmates with community reentry resource directory; provides requirements for directory; authorizes prison entrepreneurship program & award of gain-time for completion; authorizes transfer of inmate to administrative probation in certain circumstances; provides for alternative sanctioning program for probationers or offenders on community control who commit technical violations; requires sentence below statutory minimum for certain drug trafficking offenses in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing and Incarceration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125
S400 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H859 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H953 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H963 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
S1334 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94806Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback