FL H0727 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1080 (Ch. 2019-133)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1080 (Ch. 2019-133)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "hazing"; revises conduct that constitutes hazing; provides exemption from prosecution if person meets specified criteria; & provides that person is immune from prosecution under certain circumstances.
Title
Hazing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1080 (Ch. 2019-133) |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-01 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2019-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-28 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-20 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Favorable by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2019-03-14 | House | Now in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee |
2019-03-13 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-12 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1080 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-133