FL H0727 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates act "Sexual Assault Survivors' Bill of Rights"; provides various rights of survivors; provides for confidentiality of certain communications; prohibits medical provider from charging survivor for certain costs; requires that survivor be informed of specified rights before interview; provides requirements & periods of retention for certain forensic evidence; requires law enforcement officer to provide survivor with copies of certain reports; requires system for tracking sexual offense evidence kits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Survivors of Sexual Offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-16HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-11-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1028 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
H541 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S892 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
943326Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9600013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback