FL H0731 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises certain duties of AHCA relating to reporting, oversight, licensure inspections, issuance of licenses, & Medicaid fraud investigations; removes annual assessment on health care entities; removes provisions relating to multiphasic testing centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agency for Health Care Administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#746 (Y: 100 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#613 (Y: 90 N: 20 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Chapter No. 2020-156
2020-06-30 Approved by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 100 NAYS 14
2020-03-12HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (419896)
2020-03-11HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-11SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10SenateAmendment(s) adopted (419896)
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-10SenateReceived
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1726
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 90 NAYS 20
2020-03-09HouseAmendment(s) adopted (138983)
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (399477, 455657)
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-02HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-28HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-26HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-18HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-18HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 3
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/18/20, 11:30 am, Webster Hall
2020-02-07HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-07HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2020-02-07HouseCS referred to Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-07HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-16HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-11-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S378 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H771 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1726 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731
H1279 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1836 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383327Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3957015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3957016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400464Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400471Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400492Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40060501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4080611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408811Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408909Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4089091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409913Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409920Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42919Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429929Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456076Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45647Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276387Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131076Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731/BillText/e3/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731/Amendment/240783/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731/Vote/HouseVote_h00731e1613.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731/Vote/SenateVote_h00731e2027.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/731/Vote/HouseVote_h00731e2746.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback