FL H0735 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides legislative findings concerning importation of dogs & cats & importance of determining what programs result in improved adoption rates & reduction in euthanasia rates for animals in shelters & animal control agencies; provides additional records requirements for any public or private animal shelter or animal control agency operated by humane society or government; provides that such records are public records; specifies maximum copying charge; provides vaccination & other health requirements for dogs transported into state for adoption; provides that animal control agencies & registered nonprofit humane organizations are subject to such provisions.
Title
Animal Welfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 72 | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 72 | |
2011-11-21 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
823 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/735 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0735/BillText/Filed/HTML |