FL H0735 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOH to establish needle & syringe exchange pilot program in Miami-Dade County; provides for administration of pilot program by department or designee; provides that distribution of needles & syringes under pilot program is not violation of Florida Comprehensive Drug Abuse Prevention & Control Act or any other law; provides conditions under which pilot program staff member or participant may be prosecuted; prohibits collection of participant identifying information; provides for pilot program to be funded through private grants & donations; provides for expiration of pilot program; requires report to Legislature; provides rulemaking authority.
Title
Needle and Syringe Exchange Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2013-04-01 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2013-04-01 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-27 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 8:00 am, 306 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0808 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar