FL H0735 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises permitted scope of local laws, ordinances, & regulations with respect to vacation rentals; provides exemption for subsequent amendments of certain provisions of existing local laws, ordinances, & regulations adopted on or before specified date.
Title
Vacation Rentals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1344 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/735 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0735/BillText/Filed/PDF |