FL H0739 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DEO to accept applications seeking approval as growth fund; specifies application criteria; requires department to certify an applicant that has his or her application approved; requires growth fund to collect contributions & investments requires growth fund to send documentation of contributions & investments to DEO; requires DEO to provide tax credit certificate; specifies how a certification may lapse; vests taxpayers with credit against state premium tax liability; provides restrictions on credit; provides requirements regarding tax certificates; provides mechanism to exit program; requires growth fund to submit report to department annually.
Title
Rural Communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-01 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | CS by Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS by Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S298 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations