FL H0739 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employer from providing less favorable employment opportunities to employees based on their sex; provides exceptions; provides civil penalties; prohibits employer from taking certain employment actions against employees; prohibits employer from engaging in certain activities relating to wages & benefits; prohibits employer from requiring employees to sign certain waivers & documents; authorizes employer to confirm wage or salary history under certain conditions.
Title
Discrimination in Labor and Employment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-11-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S90 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
448 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
448 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
448 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/739 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/739/BillText/Filed/PDF |