FL H0745 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1286 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1286 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits introduction of certain cannabis substances, cellular telephones & other portable communication devices, & vapor-generating electronic devices into specified facilities.
Title
Contraband in Specified Facilities
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Scott Plakon [R] | Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1286 passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-27 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-26 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 4 |
2020-02-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/26/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-22 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-22 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-21 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-11-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1286 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-59
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
944 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |