FL H0755 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1060 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1060 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records & public meeting requirements for certain documents which depict structural elements of, & geographical maps indicating locations of, certain 911, E911, or public safety radio communication system infrastructure, facilities, or structures; provides for retroactive application; requires recording & transcription of exempt portions of meetings; provides an exception; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec. and Meetings/Public Safety Communication Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1060 passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-17 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-13 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/13/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-22 | House | CS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-22 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-21 | House | CS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-11-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1060 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-13
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
286 | 0113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |