FL H0761 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that it is unlawful to discriminate against any person because of protected hairstyle in areas of housing, employment, & K-20 public education system.
Title
Prohibited Discrimination
Sponsors
Rep. Kamia Brown [D] | Rep. Fentrice Driskell [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
Rep. Clovis Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-11-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S566 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/761 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/761/BillText/Filed/PDF |