FL H0763 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that vehicle may not be operated after expiration of renewal period or, for natural person, after midnight on owner's birthday unless registration was renewed before then; authorizes person who has renewed vehicle registration during early registration period to apply for refund of specified license taxes upon surrendering registration license plate before end of renewal period.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#79 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1078 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1078 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed; YEAS 28 NAYS 0 -SJ 1271 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Transportation; Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; Budget -SJ 1271 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Transportation; Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; Budget -SJ 820 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 1087 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1087 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1043 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 855 | |
2012-02-24 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 855 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/24/12, 8:30 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 322 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 322 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 12:30 pm, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-24 | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 282 | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 282 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 01/24/12, 8:15 am, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 75 | |
2011-12-12 | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 75 | |
2011-11-23 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |