FL H0763 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires licensed facilities to biennially conduct anonymous patient safety culture survey using applicable federal publication; requires facilities to biennially submit such survey to AHCA; requires agency to collect, compile, & publish survey data; revises requirements for submission of health care data to agency; provides appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Safety Culture Surveys

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#546 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Chapter No. 2020-134
2020-06-29 Approved by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1370
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2020-03-05SenateReceived
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-03-04SenateIn Messages
2020-03-04HouseCS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
2020-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20
2020-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-20HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-02-20HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-18HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-02-11HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-11HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-02-07HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-02-07HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-06HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-16HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-11-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1370 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 763

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408061Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback