FL H0773 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits applicant or licensee from establishing or implementing specified criteria for measuring sales or service performance of franchised motor vehicle dealers; requires applicant or licensee attempting to enforce such criteria to describe in writing how criteria were established & applied; requires applicant or licensee to provide in writing to each dealer of same line-make certain performance requirements, sales goals, or sales objectives for any sales incentive or reimbursement program; authorizes dealer contending that criteria violate specified provision to maintain certain injunctive & administrative actions; provides that applicant or licensee has burden of proof that criteria comply with specified provision.
Title
Franchised Motor Vehicle Dealers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1178 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/773 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/773/BillText/Filed/PDF |