FL H0775 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain funds to be used for specified purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction Industry Workforce

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Business and Professions Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1118 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
468631Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback