FL H0777 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires manufacturers to provide certain data for approval of insulation under Florida Building Code; requires that testing data comply with certain requirements.
Title
Insulation Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1420 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/777 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/777/BillText/Filed/PDF |