FL H0801 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires counselors in elementary, middle, & high schools to be certified school counselors.
Title
Certified School Counselors
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Fitzenhagen [R] | Sen. Kathleen Passidomo [R] | House Education Committee | House Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
Rep. Dane Eagle [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#319 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#319 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Chapter No. 2013-89 | |
2013-05-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-05-20 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-29 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 154 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-29 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-29 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-26 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (912849) |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/13 |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-09 | House | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/09/13, 10:30 am, Reed Hall |
2013-04-05 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2013-04-04 | House | CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-04 | House | CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/04/13, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-18 | House | Now in Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 03/18/13, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0154 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 801 (Ch. 2013-89)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 3105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |