FL H0805 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires home inspector to include certain information in his or her report; requires new residential swimming pools meet additional requirement in order to pass final inspection & receive certificate of completion; prohibits swimming pool owner from transferring ownership of swimming pool unless certain requirements are met; revises criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Swimming Pool Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Business and Professions Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S724 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4688323Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51527Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51531Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback