FL H0815 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates collaborative pharmacy practice agreement between pharmacist & physician; requires agreements to be appropriate to training & scope of practice of pharmacist & physician; requires maintenance of records; requires renewal & continuing education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Practice of Pharmacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseWithdrawn prior to introduction
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H81 (Similar To) 2018-12-14 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H111 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S300 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651865Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651895Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback