FL H0833 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises definitions of "retention" & "corporation"; provides for calculation of insurer's reimbursement premium & retention under reimbursement contract; revises coverage levels available under reimbursement contract; revises aggregate coverage limits; provides for phase-in of changes to coverage levels & limits; revises cash build-up factor included in reimbursement premiums; provides for phase-in; reduces maximum allowable emergency assessments; changes name of Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund Finance Corporation; repeals provisions related to temporary emergency options for additional coverage; terminates temporary increase in coverage limits option at end of 2011-2012 contract year; limits to 2012-2013 contract year provisions relating to TICL options addendum, TICL reimbursement premiums, & claims-paying capacity of fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2012-01-26 On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/30/12, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB --Removed from agenda
2012-01-12 On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 3:30 pm, 404 HOB --Workshopped
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 81
2011-12-12 Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 82
2011-12-01 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
215555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270629Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback