FL H0833 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs DHSMV to create Florida Homebuilders license plate; establishes annual use fee for plate; & provides for distribution of use fees received from sale of such plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates/Florida Homebuilders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2014-02-14HouseReferred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee
2014-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0714 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback