FL H0839 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires district school boards that establish school district police departments to provide contract that meets specified criteria for position of school district police chief or certain other positions.
Title
School District Police Chiefs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-12-03 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/839 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/839/BillText/Filed/PDF |