FL H0855 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school principal to provide information relating to certain instructional materials; requires school districts to provide supplemental instructional materials for educational program & to adopt policies relating to such materials; requires Commissioner of Education to review certain school district processes & provide report.
Title
Instructional Materials
Sponsors
House PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee | Rep. Walter Hill [R] | Rep. Stan McClain [R] | Rep. Cary Pigman [R] |
Rep. Spencer Roach [R] | Rep. Charlie Stone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Education Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-27 | House | CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | CS referred to Education Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Original reference(s) removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2019-03-22 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1454 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 283 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
847 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
847 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |