FL H0859 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides charter schools website requirements; requires specified teachers to have received bachelor's degree; revises requirements for charter school facilities; revises information DOE requires in specified database relating to private schools; provides requirements for private schools related to recess, statewide assessment program, curricula standards, teacher requirements, Florida Building Code requirements, & student assessments; requires private schools to be graded according to specified rules; requires DOE to annually develop, in collaboration with private schools, school report card that private schools would provide to parents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-16HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-12-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S632 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1013385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633180Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback