FL H0863 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits amount of specified examination fee; authorizes DBPR to review & approve examinations that it has certified as meeting generally accepted testing standards & specified requirements of national examination.
Title
Home Inspectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-12-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S972 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
468 | 8312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 8313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/863 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/863/BillText/Filed/PDF |