FL H0863 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes health care provider to refer patient to licensed hospital owned or leased & operated by entity in which provider has investment interest; requires health care practitioner to provide notice to patients upon referring patient to certain providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Referrals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#167 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-04HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-03HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-03HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-08HouseNow in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-03-08HouseCS referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-07HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-05HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-15HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560575Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback