FL H0877 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendments to State Constitution to authorize surviving spouse of deceased veteran to carry over certain discounts on ad valorem taxes on homestead property until surviving spouse remarries or sells or otherwise disposes of property, if, upon veteran's death, veteran had permanent, combat-related disabilities; authorizes discount to be transferred to another permanent residence if surviving spouse has not remarried.
Title
Ad Valorem Tax Discount for Spouses of Certain Deceased Veterans Who Had Permanent, Combat-Related Disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] | Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] | Rep. Randy Fine [R] |
Rep. Walter Hill [R] | Rep. MaryLynn Magar [R] | Rep. Richard Stark [D] | Rep. Jennifer Webb [D] |
Rep. Ardian Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#521 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#521 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State | |
2020-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for SJR 1076 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/20/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-11 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/11/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, 12 HOB |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-12-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H879 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-179, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 877 (Passed)
H881 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1076 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HJR 877
S1074 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 879
S1078 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H881 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1076 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HJR 877
S1074 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 879
S1078 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections