FL H0893 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits use of cellular telephone while operating motor vehicle except when using headset or hands-free device; provides for enforcement only as secondary offense.
Title
Use of Cellular Telephones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00080; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H --Workshopped | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H --Workshopped | |
2010-02-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0041 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
H0323 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0333 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0687 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0168 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0324 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0326 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0328 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0374 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0418 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0448 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0592 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0608 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0244 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S2514 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
H0323 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0333 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0687 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0168 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0324 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0326 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0328 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0374 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0418 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0448 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0592 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0608 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0244 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S2514 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation