FL H0901 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises duties of Division of Vocational Rehabilitation; requires division to provide preemployment transition services to eligible persons; requires division to enter into formal interagency agreement with state education agency for certain purposes; requires division to work with local educational agencies to provide specified services & arrange for referrals; revises provisions relating to Florida Endowment for Vocational Rehabilitation & Florida Endowment Foundation; revises requirements for individual education plans.
Title
Vocational Rehabilitation Services
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee | Rep. Mel Ponder [R] | Rep. Delores Hogan Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#493 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#493 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Chapter No. 2020-85 | |
2020-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1784 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2020-03-03 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20 |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-20 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-16 | House | CS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-16 | House | CS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, 01/16/20, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-12-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1784 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 901
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 5716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |