FL H0911 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires licensure to practice genetic counseling; provides licensure, licensure renewal, & continuing education requirements; prohibits certain acts; provides penalties & grounds for disciplinary action; authorizes DOH to enter certain orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetic Counseling

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-12HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-12-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1134 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483913Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483916Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483917Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483918Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback