FL H0915 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes certain marketing organizations in definitions of "home health agency' & "organization" for purposes of providing home health, homemaker, & companion services.
Title
Home Health Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1326 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/915 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0915/BillText/Filed/PDF |