FL H0915 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-08 - Chapter No. 2020-167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-08 - Chapter No. 2020-167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the Auditor General to conduct specified audits of certain airports; requiring certain members of the governing body of a large-hub commercial service airport to comply with certain financial disclosure requirements; requiring the governing body of a municipality, county, or special district that operates a commercial service airport to establish and maintain a website; requiring the governing body to post or provide links to certain information on the website; requiring commercial service airports to comply with certain contracting requirements; requiring governing body members and employees of a commercial service airport to comply with certain ethics requirements; requiring the department to review such information and submit an annual report to the Governor and Legislature; prohibiting the expenditure of certain funds unless specified conditions are met, etc.
Title
Commercial Service Airports
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee | Sen. Bryan Avila [R] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#572 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#572 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-08 | Chapter No. 2020-167 | |
2020-09-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-09-04 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-09 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 3 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1258 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Rules |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Rules |
2020-03-06 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-06 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (784645) |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (854565) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20 |
2020-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-14 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-13 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-22 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-16 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-16 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-15 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-12-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1258 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 915
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
332 | 0075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |