FL H0919 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-236
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-236
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises membership of council; provides exception to general law.
Title
Bay County Tourist Development Council, Bay County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#32 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#709 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#709 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Chapter No. 2014-236 | |
2014-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-05-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-21 | House | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/21/14, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2014-03-07 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/06/14, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Filed |