FL H0931 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes paramedics or emergency medical technicians to provide other treatment & transport options; provides immunity from liability for certain medical & law enforcement personnel providing emergency examination & treatment of incapacitated persons in certain circumstances; authorizes certified paramedic to administer controlled substance under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Medical Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1182 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1433Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401272Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback