FL H0933 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 732 (Ch. 2019-130)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 732 (Ch. 2019-130)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to duties of DOH, registration, office surgery requirements, prohibited physician activities, & fines & penalties; requires & authorizes Board of Medicine & Board of Osteopathic Medicine to adopt rules.
Title
Office Surgery
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | House Health Quality Subcommittee | Rep. Anthony Rodriguez [R] |
Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 732 (Ch. 2019-130) |
2019-04-26 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19 |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-17 | House | CS/CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-17 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-16 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/16/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-04-12 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-04-10 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-09 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/09/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-29 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-29 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S732 (Same As) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-130
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
395 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3266 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 328 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |