FL H0935 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits costs associated with certain solar energy systems from being included in certain cost per student station limitations.
Title
Solar Energy Systems in Educational Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Reed Hall |
2020-02-05 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/05/20, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2019-12-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1290 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/935 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/935/BillText/Filed/PDF |