FL H0941 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1274
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1274
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for submitting notice of election of exemption; revises duties of DFS relating to expiration of certificates of exemption; exempts certain limited liability companies from penalties for failure to secure payment of workers' compensation; authorizes OIR to expend funds for professional development of its employees; removes workers' compensation & employer's liability insurance from those types of insurance that must report & refund excess profits; provides that transfer of policy to certain other insurers is considered renewal of policy rather than cancellation or nonrenewal; exempts certain insurers from performing onsite premium audits for workers' compensation insurance.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1172 (Y: 99 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#770 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#770 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1274 | |
2012-03-09 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-09 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1178 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 1175 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 822 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 822 | |
2012-02-22 | In Messages | |
2012-02-16 | CS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 -HJ 639 | |
2012-02-16 | Read 3rd time -HJ 639 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-15 | Read 2nd time -HJ 621 | |
2012-02-13 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/15/12 | |
2012-01-27 | CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 290 | |
2012-01-27 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 297 | |
2012-01-26 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-25 | CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 299 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 01/25/12, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-18 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 238 | |
2012-01-17 | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 238 | |
2012-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 3:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 92 | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 92 | |
2011-12-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
440 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4133 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 442 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 6017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |