FL H0945 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-200
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-200
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires licensed assisted living facilities with 17 beds or more to possess functioning automated external defibrillator; encourages location registration; provides immunity from liability under Good Samaritan Act & Cardiac Arrest Survival Act; authorizes Department of Elderly Affairs to adopt rules relating to use of automated external defibrillators. APPROPRIATION: $146,677.
Title
Automated External Defibrillators/Assisted Living [SPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Anderson [R] | Rep. Carl Domino [R] | Rep. Clay Ford [R] | Rep. James Frishe [R] |
Rep. Edward Homan [R] | Rep. Paige Kreegel [R] | Rep. Elaine Schwartz [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0047 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0830 - Passage (Y: 99 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0830 - Passage (Y: 99 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-200 | |
2010-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Ordered enrolled | |
2010-04-30 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01190; Was taken up -SJ 01245; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 01245 | |
2010-04-29 | Received -SJ 01134; Referred to Health Regulation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary -SJ 01134; Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary -SJ 01010; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 2008 -SJ 01011; Read 2nd time -SJ 01011 | |
2010-04-21 | In Messages | |
2010-04-21 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00795; CS passed; YEAS 99 NAYS 13 -HJ 00796 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00774 | |
2010-04-12 | Original reference(s) removed: Health & Family Services Policy Council; Referred to- Calendar -HJ 00675 | |
2010-04-09 | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 9 NAYS 3 -HJ 00655; CS read 1st time on 04/09/10 -HJ 00653; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations (CGHC), 04/09/10, 11:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-15 | CS read 1st time on 03/15/10 -HJ 00277; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Health Care Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00300 | |
2010-03-09 | CS by Elder & Family Services Policy (HFPC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00280 | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Elder & Family Services Policy (HFPC), 03/09/10, 10:00 am, 24-H | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Elder & Family Services Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00084 | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Elder & Family Services Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council | |
2010-02-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2008 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Withdrawn from Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 01001; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading; Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01011; Substituted CS/CS/HB 945 -SJ 01011; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 945 (Ch. 2010-200) -SJ 01011