FL H0961 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides pharmacy benefit managers have fiduciary duty to specified individuals & entities; provides requirements for services performance, contracts, specified funds, & maximum allowable cost lists; requires pharmacy benefit managers to allow payors access to specified records; requires income & financial benefits to be passed through to payors; requires DFS to investigate violations; requires group health plans, health insurers, & pharmacy benefit managers to base plan beneficiaries' & insureds' coinsurance obligations for prescription drugs on specified drug prices.
Title
Prescription Drug Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-12-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1444 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1682 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1682 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 9201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0197 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 490 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 42385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 64741 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/961 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/961/BillText/Filed/PDF |