FL H0981 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defines "apprenticeship"; requires DBPR & DOH, respectively, to grant application for licensure if applicant has completed apprenticeship & met other specified requirements; requires department to establish grade necessary for applicant who has completed apprenticeship to receive passing grade for examination; prohibits department from requiring applicant to take examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational Licensing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Business and Professions Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S924 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
455216Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560155Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback