FL H0983 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds licensed psychologists to list of healthcare providers who are protected by limitations period from claims for overpayment being sought by health insurers or HMOs; adds licensed psychologists to list of healthcare providers who are subject to limitations period for submitting claims to health insurers or HMOs for underpayment; adds licensed psychologists to list of healthcare providers who are eligible for direct payment for medical services by health insurer.
Title
Payment for Services provided by Licensed Psychologists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 96 | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 96 | |
2011-12-09 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 6131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 638 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/983 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0983/BillText/Filed/PDF |