FL H0997 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires district school boards of specified school districts develop & execute interlocal agreements with law enforcement agencies, local fire departments, & local emergency medical services organizations for specified purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School District Communication with First Responders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-03HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-12-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S788 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1006121Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback