FL H1011 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Preempts regulation of vacation rentals & advertising platforms to state; prohibits local law, ordinance, or regulation from allowing or requiring inspections or licensing of public lodging establishments, including vacation rentals, or public food service establishments; expands exemption to allow local law, ordinance, or regulation adopted on or before specified date to be amended to be less restrictive; requires licenses issued by Division of Hotels & Restaurants of DBPR to be displayed conspicuously to public inside licensed establishment; provides requirements for owner or operator of vacation rentals & advertising platforms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacation Rentals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied on Calendar
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-06HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-24HouseCS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2020-02-24HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-20HouseCS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 9
2020-02-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2020-02-06HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2020-02-05HouseCS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 5
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-21HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-21HouseFavorable by Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5
2020-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-12-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1128 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
404056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5535041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7171355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
87724Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback