FL H1035 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a service provider to furnish and provide access to records within a specified timeframe after receiving a request for such records; requiring that certain service providers furnish such records in the manner chosen by the requester; revising the timeframe within which a nursing home facility must provide access to and copies of resident records after receiving a request for such records, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Access to Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#161 (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Health Policy; Rules
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 108 NAYS 5
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseAmendment(s) adopted (635107) 720
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-10HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-10HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-13HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-12HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138), CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3161932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161933Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3954025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429294Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456057Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback