FL H1041 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifies that certain requirements relating to reporting of positive HIV test results to county health departments apply only to testing performed in a nonhealth care setting; revises provisions relating to public information initiative on lead-based paint hazards; revises requirements for State Surgeon General's program for early identification of persons at risk of having elevated blood-lead levels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Laboratory Screening

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#177 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27 Chapter No. 2017-181
2017-06-26 Approved by Governor
2017-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-05HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-05-05SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2017-05-05SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-05-03SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-03SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1144
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-03SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-04-25SenateReceived
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-04-25SenateIn Messages
2017-04-20HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-19HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17
2017-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-07HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2017-04-07HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-04-06HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2017-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-03-28HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2017-03-28HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-03-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-03-16HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-03-15HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-03-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1144 (Same As) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181)
S1074 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181), CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164), HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381983Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381984Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381985Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38314Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback