FL H1045 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a priority area that may be addressed in a Closing the Gap grant proposal, etc.
Title
Closing the Gap Grant Proposals
Sponsors
Rep. Kamia Brown [D] | Rep. Fentrice Driskell [D] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#368 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#160 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#160 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Chapter No. 2019-154 | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-03 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2019-05-03 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-03 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (438632) 1242 |
2019-05-02 | House | In returning messages |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (438632) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1436 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-04-02 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-19 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1436 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1045 (Ch. 2019-154)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 7354 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 7355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 7356 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |