FL H1059 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides parental rights relating to a minor child's education, upbringing, & health care; provides school district, health care practitioner, hospital requirements & specified penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#587 (Y: 77 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Judiciary; Education; Rules
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 77 NAYS 41
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) failed (455883, 741543, 967535)
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (193191, 524171) 866
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-19HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2020-02-19HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-18HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 5
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-02-06HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2020-02-06HouseFavorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
2020-02-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-23HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-23HouseFavorable by Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
2020-01-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/23/20, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Education Committee; Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-12-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1634 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408813Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback