FL H1063 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 1876 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 1876 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain outlets selling hemp are subject to food permit requirements; directs DACS to submit amended plan to U.S. Secretary of Agriculture under certain circumstances; removes requirement for use of certain hemp seeds & cultivars; revises distribution & retail sale requirements for hemp extract; deems certain hemp extract as adulterated or misbranded; authorizes DACS to contract for specified services; requires rules to include specified testing & sampling procedures; provides for Industrial Hemp Advisory Council as sole program advisory body to DACS; directs DACS to provide specified report to Legislature.
Title
State Hemp Program
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee | Rep. Brad Drake [R] | Rep. Ralph Massullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 1876 passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-03-02 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/02/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-11 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-02-07 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1876 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
H921 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-135
H921 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-135
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
500 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |