FL H1073 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires health care practitioners to refer or prescribe nonpharmaceutical interventional therapies for chronic nonmalignant pain or acute pain before prescribing opioid; requires licensed massage therapist to maintain & submit certain patient records to practitioner; requires insurance to cover specified number of therapies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Practitioner Prescribing Practices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1360 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627413Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641201Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback